NH HB113 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Special Order (Rep. Cahill): Motion Failed DV 72-298 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Special Order (Rep. Cahill): Motion Failed DV 72-298 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.
Title
Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Special Order (Rep. Cahill): Motion Failed DV 72-298 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 22 |
2021-03-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 77 |
2021-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92992494588 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98476278055 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 35 |