NH HB1137 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of "excessive speeding."
Title
Relative to the definition of "excessive speeding."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 63 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 30 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 11 |