NH HB114 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to minimum electric renewable portfolio standards.
Title
Relative to minimum electric renewable portfolio standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - OTP (Y: 167 N: 164 NV: 23 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the day, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-15 | House | Reconsider HB 114 (Rep. Hopper): Motion Failed DV 164-168 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 20 |
2018-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 167-164 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 17 |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2018-01-09 | House | Special Order to next session day Without Objection House Journal 2 P. 47 |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2017-10-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-10-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-18 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-04 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-09-20 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-07-31 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 17 |
Same As/Similar To
HB114 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate