NH HB114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the state from entering into or enforcing agreements concerning sales tax collection with other states.
Title
Prohibiting the state from entering into or enforcing agreements concerning sales tax collection with other states.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 55 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 15 |
2019-10-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-31 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-31 | House | Vacated and Referred to Ways and Means (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 38 |
Same As/Similar To
HB114 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)