NH HB1143 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing limited liability for manufacturers, distributors, dealers, or importers of firearms or ammunition.
Title
Repealing limited liability for manufacturers, distributors, dealers, or importers of firearms or ammunition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 170 N: 126 NV: 54 Abs: 46) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-126 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 125 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 60 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 11 |