NH HB1165 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Lay on Table (Rep. Hatch): Motion Adopted DV 208-69 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting ATVs on a rail trail in Gorham.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting ATVs on a rail trail in Gorham.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseLay on Table (Rep. Hatch): Motion Adopted DV 208-69 03/12/2020
2020-03-11HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Horn) 03/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0966h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 26
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2020 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback