NH HB1166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 193-145 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 193-145 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to unemployment compensation, certain sanitary protections for COVID-19, extending the federal Family and Medical Leave Act for certain COVID-19 protections, and waiving cost sharing for testing and treatment for COVID-19.
Title
Relative to unemployment compensation, certain sanitary protections for COVID-19, extending the federal Family and Medical Leave Act for certain COVID-19 protections, and waiving cost sharing for testing and treatment for COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 344 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 178 N: 154 NV: 21 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Sections 1-6 and Sections 9-24 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections 1-6 and Sections 9-24 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections 7 and 24 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 178 N: 154 NV: 21 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Sections 1-6 and Sections 9-24 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections 1-6 and Sections 9-24 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections 7 and 24 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 193-145 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2020-07-17 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 70 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1629: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1629e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-154 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1471s, Sections 1-6 and Sections 9-24, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1471s: Sections 7 and 24, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1471s: Sections 1-6 and Sections 9-24, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Sen. Chandley Moved to divide the Question on 2020-1471: Sections 7 and 24, and Sections 1- 6 and Sections 9-24; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1471s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 940 7264 6718 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13017158592,,94072646718# or 13126266799,,94072646718# Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_croAzCD-TXuZDPa4hQt2XQ Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 09:05 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1349s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 208-130 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 100 |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 35 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 12 |