NH HB1182 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020; Chapter 33; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2021 II. Sec 6-13 Eff: 01/01/2021 III. Sec 3/ 4/ 18-20/ & 30-39 Eff: 09/22/2020 IV. Sec. 42 Eff: 07/01/2020 V. Rem. Eff: 07/24/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the commission to study the on road usage of non-traditional motor vehicles, relative to motor vehicles and transportation, relative to roadable aircraft, and making an appropriation to the department of education for the purpose of funding the Hudson CTE center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the commission to study the on road usage of non-traditional motor vehicles, relative to motor vehicles and transportation, relative to roadable aircraft, and making an appropriation to the department of education for the purpose of funding the Hudson CTE center.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-28HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020; Chapter 33; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2021 II. Sec 6-13 Eff: 01/01/2021 III. Sec 3/ 4/ 18-20/ & 30-39 Eff: 09/22/2020 IV. Sec. 42 Eff: 07/01/2020 V. Rem. Eff: 07/24/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Sykes): Motion Adopted DV 198-124 06/30/2020
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1488s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1488s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1488s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 975 6348 4478 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,97563484478# or +19292056099,,97563484478# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_KQia2-AmSGGniYniZncjGA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/12/2020, 09:35 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1366s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/12/2020, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 22
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0202h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 23
2020-02-19HouseAmendment # 2020-0202h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 23
2020-02-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0202h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 15
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback