NH HB1188 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to conditional licenses of allied health professionals.
Title
Relative to conditional licenses of allied health professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 25 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 15 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 13 |