NH HB1190 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to banning the pesticide chlorpyrifos.
Title
Relative to banning the pesticide chlorpyrifos.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Eisner [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] | Rep. Patricia Bushway [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] |
Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 13 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 13 |