NH HB1202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study revenue alternatives to the road toll for the funding of the state's highways and bridges.
Title
Establishing a commission to study revenue alternatives to the road toll for the funding of the state's highways and bridges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-2) |
2014-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-04-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-02-06 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 5 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public Works and Highways |