NH HB1205 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation(Vote 16-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation(Vote 16-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reconstruction or rehabilitation of the Vilas Bridge between Walpole, New Hampshire and Bellows Falls, Vermont.
Title
Relative to reconstruction or rehabilitation of the Vilas Bridge between Walpole, New Hampshire and Bellows Falls, Vermont.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cloutier [D] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
Rep. William Butynski [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation(Vote 16-0) |
2014-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-08-27 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/11/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-08-18 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 8/19/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-07-01 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/19/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-06-11 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/24/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-04-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-02-12 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 12 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public Works and Highways |