NH HB121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-158 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-158 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an independent redistricting commission.
Title
Establishing an independent redistricting commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Edward Gordon [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] |
Rep. Lisa Bunker [D] | Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 198 N: 158 NV: 13 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-158 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 35 |
2021-02-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 18 |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2021 09:30 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/95842759377 |
2021-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2021 12:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927250837Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday time permitting from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 36 |