NH HB1216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the impaired driver education program.
Title
Relative to the impaired driver education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 30 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 14 |