NH HB1217 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring police officers to report misconduct.
Title
Requiring police officers to report misconduct.
Sponsors
Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Kevin Craig [R] |
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Joel Desilets [R] | Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Rep. Chris True [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1064h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 9 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-1064h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 9 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1064h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 8 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary) |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 14 |