NH HB1218 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Rules Suspension to allow action at the present time Motion Failed not getting required 2/3 Regular Calendar 194-132 06/11/2020 House Journal 8 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Rules Suspension to allow action at the present time Motion Failed not getting required 2/3 Regular Calendar 194-132 06/11/2020 House Journal 8 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to net energy metering limits for customer generators and the purchase of output of limited electrical energy producers.
Title
Relative to net energy metering limits for customer generators and the purchase of output of limited electrical energy producers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - Rules Suspension (Y: 194 N: 132 NV: 26 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 215 N: 125 NV: 32 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 215 N: 125 NV: 32 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Rules Suspension to allow action at the present time Motion Failed not getting required 2/3 Regular Calendar 194-132 06/11/2020 House Journal 8 P. 32 |
2020-05-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-05-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1113h (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 10 |
2020-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 05/07/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/94201690197 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/04/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Municipal and County Government 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 71 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0616h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 215-125 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 71 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0616h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 71 |
2020-02-19 | House | Special Order to next order of business (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 71 |
2020-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0616h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 36 |
2020-02-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 14 |