NH HB1219 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study reducing local costs of health care for educators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study reducing local costs of health care for educators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 15
2020-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 10
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback