NH HB1227 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study options for childcare and related barriers to working parents serving in the legislature.
Title
Establishing a committee to study options for childcare and related barriers to working parents serving in the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1081h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 41 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-1081h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 41 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1081h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 24 |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/19/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 14 |