NH HB1236 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the expectation of privacy.
Title
Relative to the expectation of privacy.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Erf [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Sandra Keans [D] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0976h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 131 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0976h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 131 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0976h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 61 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-15 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 14 |