NH HB1240 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/20/2020; Chapter 25; I. Sec. 1/2 & 5 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Sec. 6 & 11 Eff: 09/18/2020 III. Sec. 3/4/12 & 13 Eff: as prov. in Sec. 14 IV. Rem. Eff: 7/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the grounds for sexual assault and related offenses, establishing a special marriage officiant license, modifying requirements for renewal of pharmacy licenses, and relative to occupational licensure and the office of professional licensure and certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the grounds for sexual assault and related offenses, establishing a special marriage officiant license, modifying requirements for renewal of pharmacy licenses, and relative to occupational licensure and the office of professional licensure and certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 348 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/20/2020; Chapter 25; I. Sec. 1/2 & 5 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Sec. 6 & 11 Eff: 09/18/2020 III. Sec. 3/4/12 & 13 Eff: as prov. in Sec. 14 IV. Rem. Eff: 7/20/2020
2020-07-14SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-07-14HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1627: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1627e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 257-68 06/30/2020
2020-06-29SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1603s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this Body: Rescind Order to Third Reading, and Reconsider the Vote on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1603s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateWithout Objection, take up at the present time, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateSen. Hennessey Floor Amendment # 2020-1603s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateSen. Feltes Moved Ought to Pass; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0556h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 10
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0556h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 10
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0556h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 8
2020-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary)
2020-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-02-19House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/25/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2513&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1240
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1650&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1650
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=1650
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1650
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=94&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1240&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1240&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2513
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=96&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1240&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1240&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2513
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=185&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1240&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1240&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2513

Bill Comments

feedback