NH HB1247 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to mortgage defaults and nonpayment of rent during the novel coronavirus disease (Covid-19) outbreak state of emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mortgage defaults and nonpayment of rent during the novel coronavirus disease (Covid-19) outbreak state of emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 108 NV: 55 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2020
2020-07-06HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020
2020-07-06SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 187-135 06/30/2020
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1535s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2062; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Chandley Floor Amendment # 2020-1535s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2062; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1494s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 06/16/2062; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1494s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 949 7163 2122 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 19292056099,,94971632122# or +13017158592,,94971632122# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900¬6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_GczpBlBoSO6SqCEMuhnt1A Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 09:40 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1363s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-04SenateHB 1247 is vacated from Commerce and referred to Judiciary; (In recess 03/12/2020); Senate Journal 8
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0687h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-108 03/12/2020
2020-03-12HouseAmendment # 2020-0687h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0687h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 61
2020-01-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/14/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2523&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1247
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1660&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1660
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1660
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=137&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2523
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=85&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2523
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=198&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2523

Bill Comments

feedback