NH HB1248 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to community revitalization tax relief incentives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to community revitalization tax relief incentives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
2020-05-07HouseExecutive Session: 05/12/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/91719044913
2020-03-11House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-03-04HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/09/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-26House==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/04/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 67
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0613h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 67
2020-02-19HouseAmendment # 2020-0613h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 67
2020-02-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-02-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0613h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 23
2020-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2020-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback