NH HB1250 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the use and location of Lucky 7 machines.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the use and location of Lucky 7 machines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202 |
2018-09-05 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2018 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-02-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 16 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 17 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 4 |