NH HB1261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 172; I. Sec. 1 eff. as prov. in sec. 3; II. Rem. eff. 7/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 172; I. Sec. 1 eff. as prov. in sec. 3; II. Rem. eff. 7/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports.
Title
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 172; I. Sec. 1 eff. as prov. in sec. 3; II. Rem. eff. 7/1/2019 |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1954e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1954e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0729h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0729h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0729h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 4 |