NH HB1267 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/02/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98387930737 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/02/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98387930737 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the liability of directors and officers of New Hampshire nonprofit corporations.
Title
Relative to the liability of directors and officers of New Hampshire nonprofit corporations.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] |
Rep. Latha Mangipudi [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/02/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98387930737 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 6 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 5 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 15 |