NH HB1268 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 225-47 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 225-47 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study student loan forgiveness on the basis of volunteer work, including service in the legislature.
Title
Establishing a committee to study student loan forgiveness on the basis of volunteer work, including service in the legislature.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Rep. Ryan Buchanan [D] | Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] |
Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 225-47 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 218 |
2020-03-11 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Schultz) 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 10 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 16 |