NH HB127 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-25 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2702h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-25 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2702h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of oral communication.
Title
Relative to the definition of oral communication.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Lars Christiansen [R] | Rep. Jennifer Coffey [R] | Rep. John Hikel [R] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-25 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2702h | |
2011-10-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2702h for Jan 4 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) | |
2011-10-05 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-10-05 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2011 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-02 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-02-16 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/22/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-02-10 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/15/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 (Orig 8:00 Amendment) | |
2011-02-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/8/2011 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-26 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-07 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 172 |