NH HB1273 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure of health care professionals employed at the Manchester Veterans Affairs Medical Center.
Title
Relative to licensure of health care professionals employed at the Manchester Veterans Affairs Medical Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] |
Rep. Sean Morrison [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Brian Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment 1369s (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-08 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Gray, Hennessey; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Baldasaro, Massimilla, Hansen, McGuire 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1369s and Requests CofC (Reps. R. Ober, McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1369s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2018-1369s, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 19 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/27/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0104h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendment # 2018-0104h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0104h (NT) for 02/07/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 16 |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-16 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-0104h: 01/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/17/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 5 |