NH HB1278 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/23/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/99116539335 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/23/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/99116539335 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of psychotropic medications for children in foster care.
Title
Relative to the use of psychotropic medications for children in foster care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/23/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/99116539335 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 72 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 33 |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2020 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 16 |