NH HB1279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the terms resident, inhabitant, residence, and residency.
Title
Relative to the terms resident, inhabitant, residence, and residency.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Bruce Cohen [D] | Rep. Mary Mulligan [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 189 N: 133 NV: 23 Abs: 51) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 189-133 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 64 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 51 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 16 |