NH HB1288 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the form of a candidate's name on the official ballot in nonpartisan town elections.
Title
Relative to the form of a candidate's name on the official ballot in nonpartisan town elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Patricia Bushway [D] | Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] |
Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0128h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 3 |
2020-02-13 | House | Amendment # 2020-0128h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 3 |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0128h for 02/13/2020 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 3 |
2020-01-14 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 16 |