NH HB130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB130
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 02/06/2020; Chapter 1; Eff: 04/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 02/06/2020; Chapter 1; Eff: 04/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to property tax relief for totally and permanently disabled veterans.
Title
Relative to property tax relief for totally and permanently disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Panasiti [R] | Rep. Michael Gunski [R] | Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Rep. Joel Desilets [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 02/06/2020; Chapter 1; Eff: 04/01/2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Enrolled 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 58 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 01/08/2020); Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0378h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0378h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0378h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 12 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 38 |
Same As/Similar To
HB130 (Carry Over) 2019-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar