NH HB1317 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding for energy efficiency and renewable energy projects by residential, commercial, and industrial ratepayers.
Title
Relative to funding for energy efficiency and renewable energy projects by residential, commercial, and industrial ratepayers.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 61 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 28 |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 17 |