NH HB1324 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting rentals of shared facilities from requirements under the real estate practice act.
Title
Exempting rentals of shared facilities from requirements under the real estate practice act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0154h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 12 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0154h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 12 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0154h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 8 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 18 |