NH HB1325 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to minutes and decisions in nonpublic sessions under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to minutes and decisions in nonpublic sessions under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 40
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 22
2020-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback