NH HB1326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the independent investment committee of the New Hampshire retirement system to report investment fees.
Title
Requiring the independent investment committee of the New Hampshire retirement system to report investment fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Kathy Desjardin [D] | Rep. David Doherty [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] |
Rep. Arthur Ellison [D] | Rep. Mark Pearson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 26 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 16 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 18 |