NH HB1331 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 62; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to incidental uses for agricultural plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to incidental uses for agricultural plates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 62; Eff. 7/24/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-19HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1262s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2
2018-04-05SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1262s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-04-05SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1262s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1262s, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 56
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 32
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 203
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback