NH HB1334 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 03/30/2018; Chapter 7; I. Sec. 2 eff. 8/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 3/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 03/30/2018; Chapter 7; I. Sec. 2 eff. 8/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 3/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to review the structure of motor vehicle laws.
Title
Establishing a commission to review the structure of motor vehicle laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 03/30/2018; Chapter 7; I. Sec. 2 eff. 8/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 3/30/2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 03/21/2018); Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-21 | House | Enrolled 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 61 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 16 |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 7 |