NH HB1335 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-142 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-142 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to private rights of action regarding pupil safety.
Title
Relative to private rights of action regarding pupil safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] |
Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - ITL (Y: 183 N: 142 NV: 20 Abs: 51) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-142 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2020-01-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-01-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/13/2020 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 5 |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/28/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/21/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 18 |