NH HB1339 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-129 02/13/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to damage to crops or livestock done by animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to damage to crops or livestock done by animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - ITL (Y: 199 N: 129 NV: 17 Abs: 51) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-129 02/13/2020
2020-01-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0134h
2020-01-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/13/2020 (Vote 13-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 5
2020-01-09HouseExecutive Session: 01/21/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/14/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback