NH HB1354 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 348; Eff. 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 348; Eff. 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the speaker of the house of representatives and senate president as members of the university system board of trustees.
Title
Relative to the speaker of the house of representatives and senate president as members of the university system board of trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - OTP (Y: 164 N: 155 NV: 44 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 348; Eff. 07/02/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2104e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2104e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2045c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2045c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2045c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Giuda, Daniels, D'Allesandro; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, M. Moffett, T. Wolf, Leishman 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1441s and Requests CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1441s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1441s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1441s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 164-155 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 127 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 51 |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 8 |