NH HB1368 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 150-121 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 150-121 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political contributions made by limited liability companies.
Title
Relative to political contributions made by limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 150 N: 121 NV: 91 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 150-121 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 136 |
2018-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 52 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 8 |