NH HB1369 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 188-155 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 188-155 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the acceptance of high school course credits from certain schools or education agencies.
Title
Relative to the acceptance of high school course credits from certain schools or education agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 188-155 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0098h |
2020-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 29 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 19 |