NH HB137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 77; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 06/30/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 06/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to examine the effects of wake boats in the state of New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to examine the effects of wake boats in the state of New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 77; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 06/30/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 06/18/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1651s (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1651s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1651s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1651s, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-10SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0931h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 29
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0931h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 29
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0931h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-03-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-28House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-15House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:20 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback