NH HB1378 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - House Signed by the Governor 06/01/2010; Effective 07/31/2010; Chapter 0108

Summary

Establishing an adopt-a-state park program in the state park system and establishing an adopt-a-forest fire tower program in the division of forests and lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an adopt-a-state park program in the state park system and establishing an adopt-a-forest fire tower program in the division of forests and lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-03 House Signed by the Governor 06/01/2010; Effective 07/31/2010; Chapter 0108
2010-05-12 Senate Enrolled
2010-05-12 House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097
2010-04-28 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1407s (Rep Spang): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG.1724
2010-04-21 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution
2010-04-21 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1407s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2010-04-21 Senate Committee Amendment 1407s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2010-04-15 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1407s, 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16
2010-03-17 Senate Hearing: March 25, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12
2010-03-03 Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy, Environment and Economic Development
2010-02-17 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0286h (New Title): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.976-977
2010-02-17 House Amendment #0286h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.976-977
2010-02-10 House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783
2010-02-10 House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748
2010-02-03 House Proposed Committee Amendment #0286h (New Title); House Calendar 13, PG.567
2010-02-03 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0286h (New Title) for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 18-0); House Calendar 13, PG.532
2010-01-27 House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2010-01-20 House Public Hearing: 1/26/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2009-12-10 House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 6, PG.238

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback