NH HB1378 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to transfer by pharmacy technicians of prescription drugs between pharmacies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transfer by pharmacy technicians of prescription drugs between pharmacies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-03 House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0036
2012-04-18 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 11, Pg.383
2012-04-11 House Enrolled
2012-04-11 Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.350
2012-04-03 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/11/12; Senate Calendar 14
2012-03-08 Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 3/15/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 2:25 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10
2012-02-27 Senate Hearing: 3/15/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9A
2012-02-15 Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6, Pg.145
2012-02-08 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0486h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.849
2012-02-08 House Amendment #0486h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.849
2012-01-31 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0486h; House Calendar 6, PG.337
2012-01-31 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0486h for Feb 8 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 6, PG.287
2012-01-10 House Public Hearing: 1/31/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 ==Executive Session To Follow==
2011-11-21 House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 7, PG.353

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback