NH HB1378 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing sugar packet requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing sugar packet requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-19 - House - ITL (Y: 220 N: 116 NV: 25 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-19HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-116
2014-03-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2014-03-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19
2014-02-17HouseExecutive Session: 2/20/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2014-02-11HousePublic Hearing: 2/18/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2014-01-09HouseVacated from Health, Human Services and Referred to Commerce
2013-12-16HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback