NH HB1378 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 67; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to domestic insurance company investments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to domestic insurance company investments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 67; Eff. 7/24/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-18HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1494e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 29
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1494e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 9
2018-02-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback