NH HB1379 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a background check for commercial firearms sales.
Title
Requiring a background check for commercial firearms sales.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. David Huot [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
Rep. Mary Mulligan [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - OTP (Y: 196 N: 152 NV: 11 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-152 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 4 |
2020-01-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-01-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 28 |
2020-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 20 |