NH HB1382 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing April 8, 2024 as Solar Eclipse Day.
Title
Establishing April 8, 2024 as Solar Eclipse Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Kevin Craig [R] | Rep. Troy Merner [R] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] |
Rep. Peter Somssich [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Chretien [D] | Sen. David Starr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 244 N: 67 NV: 38 Abs: 47) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 244-67 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 100 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 55 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 20 |